Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Urban Renewal -see also- Commercial Rehabilitation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0032
Title
Restoring and Sustaining Baltimore City Communities Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0036 /CH0607
Title
Rebuilding Baltimore City Communities Act of 2016
Sponsor
Baltimore City Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0684 /CH0029 (SB0558)
Title
Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program - Codified
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1507 (SB0974)
Title
Arts and Entertainment Districts - Artistic Work - Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0033 (HB0642/CH0110)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0558 (HB0684/CH0029)
Title
Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program - Codified
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0974 (HB1507)
Title
Arts and Entertainment Districts - Artistic Work - Eligibility
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0032 Restoring and Sustaining Baltimore City Communities Act of 2016 Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/27/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB0036 /CH0607 Rebuilding Baltimore City Communities Act of 2016 Baltimore City Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 607
Ways and Means
1/27/2016 - 2:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0684 /CH0029 (SB0558) Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program - Codified Delegate Hammen 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 29
Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1507 (SB0974) Arts and Entertainment Districts - Artistic Work - Eligibility Delegate McCray 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0033 (HB0642/CH0110) Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses Senator Astle 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0558 (HB0684/CH0029) Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program - Codified Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0974 (HB1507) Arts and Entertainment Districts - Artistic Work - Eligibility Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:51 PM