Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Urban Renewal -see also- Commercial Rehabilitation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0394 (SB0317/CH0149)
Title
More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0659 /CH0615 (SB0823/CH0616)
Title
Task Force to Study Tax Sales in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1078 (SB0838)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Washington County - Hagerstown Urban Improvement Project
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1323 /CH0241
Title
Property Tax - Credit for Revitalization Districts
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1345 /CH0523
Title
National Capital Strategic Economic Development Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0317 /CH0149 (HB0394)
Title
More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0823 /CH0616 (HB0659/CH0615)
Title
Task Force to Study Tax Sales in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0838 (HB1078)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Washington County - Hagerstown Urban Improvement Project
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0394 (SB0317/CH0149) More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017 Speaker 3 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0659 /CH0615 (SB0823/CH0616) Task Force to Study Tax Sales in Maryland Delegate Angel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 615
Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1078 (SB0838) Creation of a State Debt - Washington County - Hagerstown Urban Improvement Project Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/13/2017 - 11:30 AM
HB1323 /CH0241 Property Tax - Credit for Revitalization Districts Delegate Long 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241
Ways and Means
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1345 /CH0523 National Capital Strategic Economic Development Fund Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 523
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0317 /CH0149 (HB0394) More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149
Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0823 /CH0616 (HB0659/CH0615) Task Force to Study Tax Sales in Maryland Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 616
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0838 (HB1078) Creation of a State Debt - Washington County - Hagerstown Urban Improvement Project Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2017 - 10:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:53 PM