Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Urban Renewal -see also- Commercial Rehabilitation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0488 (SB0467/CH0223)
Title
Forestry - Mel Noland Fellowship Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1315 /CH0455 (SB0432/CH0454)
Title
Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1347 /CH0737
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt – Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0432 /CH0454 (HB1315/CH0455)
Title
Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0467 /CH0223 (HB0488)
Title
Forestry - Mel Noland Fellowship Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0581 /CH0211 (HB1260)
Title
Economic, Housing, and Community Development – Opportunity Zone Incentives
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0488 (SB0467/CH0223) Forestry - Mel Noland Fellowship Program - Establishment Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1315 /CH0455 (SB0432/CH0454) Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Revisions Delegate Glenn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 455
Appropriations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1347 /CH0737 Prior Authorizations of State Debt – Alterations Delegate Jones 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 737
Appropriations
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2019 - 12:45 PM
SB0432 /CH0454 (HB1315/CH0455) Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Revisions Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0467 /CH0223 (HB0488) Forestry - Mel Noland Fellowship Program - Establishment Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0581 /CH0211 (HB1260) Economic, Housing, and Community Development – Opportunity Zone Incentives Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2019 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM