Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Urban Renewal -see also- Commercial Rehabilitation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0434 /CH0206
Title
Prince George's County - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Multiphase Economic Development Projects and Sunset Repeal PG 408-20
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1189 (SB0063/CH0509)
Title
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit for Newly Constructed Dwellings - Reauthorization and Modification
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1385
Title
Town of Mount Airy (Carroll County and Frederick County) - Urban Renewal Authority
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1454 /CH0477
Title
Howard County - Transfer Tax - Rate Increase Authorization Ho. Co. 26-20
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0063 /CH0509 (HB1189)
Title
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit for Newly Constructed Dwellings - Reauthorization and Modification
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0434 /CH0206 Prince George's County - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Multiphase Economic Development Projects and Sunset Repeal PG 408-20 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 206
Ways and Means
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1189 (SB0063/CH0509) Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit for Newly Constructed Dwellings - Reauthorization and Modification Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1385 Town of Mount Airy (Carroll County and Frederick County) - Urban Renewal Authority Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1454 /CH0477 Howard County - Transfer Tax - Rate Increase Authorization Ho. Co. 26-20 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 477
Ways and Means
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0063 /CH0509 (HB1189) Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit for Newly Constructed Dwellings - Reauthorization and Modification Senator Hayes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 509
Budget and Taxation
1/15/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/8/2020 3:40 PM