Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Vandalism

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0202
Title
Criminal Law - Malicious Destruction of Property - Transit Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Stukes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0737
Title
Crimes - Malicious Destruction of Property by Graffiti - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Olszewski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0742 /CH0386 (SB0991)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Citation Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1150
Title
Prince George's County - Food Service Facilities - Letter Grading PG 313-13
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1217
Title
Food Service Facilities - Letter Grading
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0991 (HB0742/CH0386)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Citation Authority
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0202 Criminal Law - Malicious Destruction of Property - Transit Vehicles Delegate Stukes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0737 Crimes - Malicious Destruction of Property by Graffiti - Penalties Delegate Olszewski 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0742 /CH0386 (SB0991) Criminal Procedure - Citation Authority Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386
Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1150 Prince George's County - Food Service Facilities - Letter Grading PG 313-13 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1217 Food Service Facilities - Letter Grading Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0991 (HB0742/CH0386) Criminal Procedure - Citation Authority Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM