Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Vandalism

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0020
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Security - School Resource Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0897
Title
Crimes - Malicious Destruction of Property - Repeat Offenders
Sponsor
Delegate Olszewski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0967
Title
Crimes - Malicious Destruction of Property - Defenses
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1186
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by Summons
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0020 Primary and Secondary Education - Security - School Resource Officers Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0897 Crimes - Malicious Destruction of Property - Repeat Offenders Delegate Olszewski 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0967 Crimes - Malicious Destruction of Property - Defenses Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1186 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by Summons Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 3:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2014 - 3:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM