Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Vandalism

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0028
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Security - School Resource Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0227
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of Abuse
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0270 (SB0404)
Title
Criminal Law - Arson, Burning, Malicious Destruction, and Theft - Property of Another - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0494
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by Summons
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0129
Title
Criminal Law - Desecration of Human Remains - Penalty
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0404 (HB0270)
Title
Criminal Law - Arson, Burning, Malicious Destruction, and Theft - Property of Another - Definition
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0028 Primary and Secondary Education - Security - School Resource Officers Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 3:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/28/2015 - 3:00 PM
HB0227 Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of Abuse Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0270 (SB0404) Criminal Law - Arson, Burning, Malicious Destruction, and Theft - Property of Another - Definition Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0494 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by Summons Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0129 Criminal Law - Desecration of Human Remains - Penalty Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0404 (HB0270) Criminal Law - Arson, Burning, Malicious Destruction, and Theft - Property of Another - Definition Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM