Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Vandalism

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0026
Title
Criminal Law - Arson, Burning, Malicious Destruction, and Theft - Property of Another - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0050
Title
Hate Crimes - Prohibitions and Protected Classes - Expansion to Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0198
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Security - School Resource Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1111
Title
Notary Public - Electronic and Remote Notary Services
Sponsor
Delegate Platt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1396 (SB0960)
Title
Domestic Violence - Education and Definition of Abuse
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0158
Title
Criminal Law - Arson, Burning, Malicious Destruction, and Theft - Property of Another - Definition
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0960 (HB1396)
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of Abuse
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0026 Criminal Law - Arson, Burning, Malicious Destruction, and Theft - Property of Another - Definition Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0050 Hate Crimes - Prohibitions and Protected Classes - Expansion to Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0198 Primary and Secondary Education - Security - School Resource Officers Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1111 Notary Public - Electronic and Remote Notary Services Delegate Platt 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1396 (SB0960) Domestic Violence - Education and Definition of Abuse Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0158 Criminal Law - Arson, Burning, Malicious Destruction, and Theft - Property of Another - Definition Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2016 - 1:30 PM
SB0960 (HB1396) Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of Abuse Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:51 PM