Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Vandalism

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0408 (SB0477)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - Citation
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0803 (SB0900)
Title
Domestic Violence - Education and Definition of Abuse
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1272
Title
Prince George's County - Domestic Violence - Definition of Abuse PG 314-17
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1334 /CH0761
Title
State Highway Administration - Traffic Control Devices - Decorative Treatments
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0477 (HB0408)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - Citation
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0900 (HB0803)
Title
Domestic Violence - Education and Definition of Abuse
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0408 (SB0477) Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - Citation Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0803 (SB0900) Domestic Violence - Education and Definition of Abuse Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1272 Prince George's County - Domestic Violence - Definition of Abuse PG 314-17 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1334 /CH0761 State Highway Administration - Traffic Control Devices - Decorative Treatments Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 761
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0477 (HB0408) Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - Citation Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0900 (HB0803) Domestic Violence - Education and Definition of Abuse Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:53 PM