Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Vandalism

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0004
Title
Crimes – Hate Crimes – Use of an Item or a Symbol to Threaten or Intimidate
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0782 (SB0691)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0907
Title
Criminal Law - Malicious Destruction of Property - Definition of Property of Another
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0935
Title
Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Use of Land - Signs Forbidding Trespassing, Hunting, or the Destruction of Property
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0691 (HB0782)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0004 Crimes – Hate Crimes – Use of an Item or a Symbol to Threaten or Intimidate Delegate Chang 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/15/2019 - 3:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0782 (SB0691) Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2019) Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0907 Criminal Law - Malicious Destruction of Property - Definition of Property of Another Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0935 Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Use of Land - Signs Forbidding Trespassing, Hunting, or the Destruction of Property Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0691 (HB0782) Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2019) Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM