Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Vending Machines

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0108 (SB0037)
Title
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0679
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Health and Safety - Chemical-Free Schools Act
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0964
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Snack Food - Application
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0982 (SB0684)
Title
Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container and Litter Reduction Program
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1095 (SB0504)
Title
Public Schools - Nutrition Standards - Vending Machines and Marketing
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0037 (HB0108)
Title
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0504 (HB1095)
Title
Public Schools - Nutrition Standards - Vending Machines and Marketing
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0684 (HB0982)
Title
Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container and Litter Reduction Program
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0108 (SB0037) Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0679 Primary and Secondary Education - Health and Safety - Chemical-Free Schools Act Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0964 Sales and Use Tax - Snack Food - Application Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0982 (SB0684) Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container and Litter Reduction Program Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1095 (SB0504) Public Schools - Nutrition Standards - Vending Machines and Marketing Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0037 (HB0108) Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
Finance
SB0504 (HB1095) Public Schools - Nutrition Standards - Vending Machines and Marketing Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0684 (HB0982) Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container and Litter Reduction Program Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Referred to interim study by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM