Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Vending Machines

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0071 (SB0514)
Title
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0775
Title
Criminal Law - Tobacco Products - Minimum Age
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1498 (SB0602)
Title
Maryland Healthy Vending Machine Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0514 (HB0071)
Title
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0602 (HB1498)
Title
Maryland Healthy Vending Machine Act
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0659
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0071 (SB0514) Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0775 Criminal Law - Tobacco Products - Minimum Age Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1498 (SB0602) Maryland Healthy Vending Machine Act Delegate Hayes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0514 (HB0071) Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0602 (HB1498) Maryland Healthy Vending Machine Act Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0659 Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:51 PM