Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Vending Machines

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0003 (SB0233)
Title
Business Regulation – Tobacco Products – Electronic Smoking Devices, Prohibition on Flavoring, and Sales to Military Members
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1145
Title
Maryland Meals for Achievement Fund – Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1284
Title
State Tax Credits, Exemptions, and Deductions - Alterations and Repeal (Tax Modernization Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1628
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction and Services
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0233 (HB0003)
Title
Business Regulation - Flavored Tobacco Products - Prohibition
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0003 (SB0233) Business Regulation – Tobacco Products – Electronic Smoking Devices, Prohibition on Flavoring, and Sales to Military Members Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Finance
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1145 Maryland Meals for Achievement Fund – Establishment Delegate Jackson, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1284 State Tax Credits, Exemptions, and Deductions - Alterations and Repeal (Tax Modernization Act) Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1628 Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction and Services Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
3/02/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0233 (HB0003) Business Regulation - Flavored Tobacco Products - Prohibition President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/15/2020 6:15 PM