Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Veterans Affairs, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0186 /CH0317
Title
Department of Veterans Affairs - Charlotte Hall Veterans Home Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0685
Title
Department of Aging - Comprehensive Plan for the Aging Population
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0746
Title
Human Services - No Wrong Door Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1007 /CH0287
Title
Freedom to Vote Act
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0011
Title
Freedom to Vote Act
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0284
Title
Natural Resources - Complimentary Hunting and Fishing Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0186 /CH0317 Department of Veterans Affairs - Charlotte Hall Veterans Home Fund - Establishment Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2016 - 3:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0685 Department of Aging - Comprehensive Plan for the Aging Population Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0746 Human Services - No Wrong Door Pilot Program Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1007 /CH0287 Freedom to Vote Act Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Ways and Means
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0011 Freedom to Vote Act Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0284 Natural Resources - Complimentary Hunting and Fishing Licenses Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:51 PM