Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Veterans Affairs, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0274
Title
Veterans - Availability and Accessibility of Health Care Services and Transportation - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0275 /CH0183
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Recommended Courses in Military Culture
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1275 /CH0706 (SB0857/CH0707)
Title
State Government - Department of Veterans Affairs - Veterans' Services Specialists
Sponsor
Delegate Vogt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0441 /CH0416
Title
Veterans Affairs - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0857 /CH0707 (HB1275/CH0706)
Title
State Government - Department of Veterans Affairs - Veterans' Services Specialists
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1084 /CH0709 (HB0587/CH0708)
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprises - Definitions and Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0274 Veterans - Availability and Accessibility of Health Care Services and Transportation - Study Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0275 /CH0183 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Recommended Courses in Military Culture Delegate Queen 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 183
Health and Government Operations
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1275 /CH0706 (SB0857/CH0707) State Government - Department of Veterans Affairs - Veterans' Services Specialists Delegate Vogt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 706
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2017 - 12:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0441 /CH0416 Veterans Affairs - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Establishment Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0857 /CH0707 (HB1275/CH0706) State Government - Department of Veterans Affairs - Veterans' Services Specialists Senator Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 707
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1084 /CH0709 (HB0587/CH0708) State Finance and Procurement - Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprises - Definitions and Penalties Senator Waugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 709
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:53 PM