Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Veterans Affairs, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0012 (SB0341)
Title
Department of Veterans Affairs - Homes for Veterans - Veterans of Uniformed Service
Sponsor
Delegate Rogers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0131 (SB0059)
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations ("ITLM" for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0997
Title
Task Force to Study Veterans' Suicide Causes and Prevention
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1387
Title
Certificates for Involuntary Admission - Licensed Certified Social Worker-Clinical
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1600
Title
Task Force to Study the Establishment of Regional Centers for Women Veterans
Sponsor
Delegate Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0059 (HB0131)
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations ("Slots" for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0084
Title
Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans - Notification, Disposition, and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0090
Title
Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Definitions
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0341 (HB0012)
Title
Department of Veterans Affairs - Homes for Veterans - Veterans of Uniformed Service
Sponsor
Senator Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0012 (SB0341) Department of Veterans Affairs - Homes for Veterans - Veterans of Uniformed Service Delegate Rogers 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
1/29/2020 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0131 (SB0059) State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations ("ITLM" for Homeless Veterans Act) Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/30/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0997 Task Force to Study Veterans' Suicide Causes and Prevention Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1387 Certificates for Involuntary Admission - Licensed Certified Social Worker-Clinical Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1600 Task Force to Study the Establishment of Regional Centers for Women Veterans Delegate Patterson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0059 (HB0131) State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations ("Slots" for Homeless Veterans Act) Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/09/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0084 Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans - Notification, Disposition, and Reporting Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2020 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0090 Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Definitions Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0341 (HB0012) Department of Veterans Affairs - Homes for Veterans - Veterans of Uniformed Service Senator Griffith 2 2 In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/21/2020 12:41 PM