Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Veterinarians

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0080
Title
Civil Actions - Liability for Personal Injury or Death Caused by Dog
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0371
Title
Criminal Law - Dangerous Dogs - Registration and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0665 (SB0659/CH0185)
Title
Crimes Relating to Animals - Surgery on Dogs - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0667 /CH0187 (SB0660/CH0186)
Title
Crimes Relating to Animals - Unauthorized Surgical Devocalization of Cat or Dog - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1347 (SB0862)
Title
Animal Welfare - Research Facilities - Dogs and Cats
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1357
Title
Income Tax Credit - Veterinary Services for Adopted Police Dogs
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0659 /CH0185 (HB0665)
Title
Crimes Relating to Animals - Surgery on Dogs - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0660 /CH0186 (HB0667/CH0187)
Title
Crimes Relating to Animals - Unauthorized Surgical Devocalization of Cat or Dog - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0862 (HB1347)
Title
Animal Welfare - Research Facilities - Dogs and Cats
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0080 Civil Actions - Liability for Personal Injury or Death Caused by Dog Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/23/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0371 Criminal Law - Dangerous Dogs - Registration and Penalties Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0665 (SB0659/CH0185) Crimes Relating to Animals - Surgery on Dogs - Penalties Delegate Kramer 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0667 /CH0187 (SB0660/CH0186) Crimes Relating to Animals - Unauthorized Surgical Devocalization of Cat or Dog - Penalties Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 187
Judiciary
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1347 (SB0862) Animal Welfare - Research Facilities - Dogs and Cats Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1357 Income Tax Credit - Veterinary Services for Adopted Police Dogs Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0659 /CH0185 (HB0665) Crimes Relating to Animals - Surgery on Dogs - Penalties Senator Gladden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0660 /CH0186 (HB0667/CH0187) Crimes Relating to Animals - Unauthorized Surgical Devocalization of Cat or Dog - Penalties Senator Gladden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0862 (HB1347) Animal Welfare - Research Facilities - Dogs and Cats Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM