Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Veterinarians

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0046 /CH0248
Title
Animal Control Units - Impounded Animals - Identification
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0211 /CH0662 (SB0198/CH0661)
Title
Neonicotinoid Pesticides - Restrictions on Sales and Use (Pollinator Protection Act of 2016)
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0438 (SB0917)
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement - Veterinary Care of Retired Law Enforcement K-9s Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0494 /CH0267
Title
Agriculture - Animal Shelters - Uniform Standards of Operation and Care (Animal Shelters Standards Act of 2016)
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0829 (SB0607)
Title
Agriculture - Cattle, Swine, and Poultry - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0980
Title
State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners - Disciplinary Action Report - Publication on Web Site
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1163
Title
Agriculture - Veterinary Feed Directives - Information Collection
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1322
Title
Income Tax Credit - Veterinary Services for Adopted Police Dogs
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1462 /CH0688 (SB0614/CH0687)
Title
Veterinarians, Pharmacies, and Pharmacists - Dispensing Compounded Preparations for Use by Nonfarm Animals
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1586 (SB0722)
Title
Crimes Related to Animals - Penalties - Mandatory Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1607 (SB1052/CH0025)
Title
University of Maryland Strategic Partnership Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0198 /CH0661 (HB0211/CH0662)
Title
Neonicotinoid Pesticides - Restrictions on Sales and Use (Pollinator Protection Act of 2016)
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0607 (HB0829)
Title
Agriculture - Cattle, Swine, and Poultry - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0614 /CH0687 (HB1462/CH0688)
Title
Veterinarians, Pharmacies, and Pharmacists - Dispensing Compounded Preparations for Use by Nonfarm Animals
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0722 (HB1586)
Title
Crimes Related to Animals - Penalties - Mandatory Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0917 (HB0438)
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement - Veterinary Care of Retired Law Enforcement K-9s Act
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1052 /CH0025 (HB1607)
Title
University of Maryland Strategic Partnership Act of 2016
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0046 /CH0248 Animal Control Units - Impounded Animals - Identification Delegate Chang 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248
Environment and Transportation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0211 /CH0662 (SB0198/CH0661) Neonicotinoid Pesticides - Restrictions on Sales and Use (Pollinator Protection Act of 2016) Delegate Healey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 662
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0438 (SB0917) Public Safety - Law Enforcement - Veterinary Care of Retired Law Enforcement K-9s Act Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0494 /CH0267 Agriculture - Animal Shelters - Uniform Standards of Operation and Care (Animal Shelters Standards Act of 2016) Delegate Miele 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0829 (SB0607) Agriculture - Cattle, Swine, and Poultry - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0980 State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners - Disciplinary Action Report - Publication on Web Site Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1163 Agriculture - Veterinary Feed Directives - Information Collection Delegate Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1322 Income Tax Credit - Veterinary Services for Adopted Police Dogs Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/14/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1462 /CH0688 (SB0614/CH0687) Veterinarians, Pharmacies, and Pharmacists - Dispensing Compounded Preparations for Use by Nonfarm Animals Delegate Bromwell 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 688
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1586 (SB0722) Crimes Related to Animals - Penalties - Mandatory Reporting Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1607 (SB1052/CH0025) University of Maryland Strategic Partnership Act of 2016 Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0198 /CH0661 (HB0211/CH0662) Neonicotinoid Pesticides - Restrictions on Sales and Use (Pollinator Protection Act of 2016) Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 661
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0607 (HB0829) Agriculture - Cattle, Swine, and Poultry - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0614 /CH0687 (HB1462/CH0688) Veterinarians, Pharmacies, and Pharmacists - Dispensing Compounded Preparations for Use by Nonfarm Animals Senator Conway 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 687
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0722 (HB1586) Crimes Related to Animals - Penalties - Mandatory Reporting Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0917 (HB0438) Public Safety - Law Enforcement - Veterinary Care of Retired Law Enforcement K-9s Act Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1052 /CH0025 (HB1607) University of Maryland Strategic Partnership Act of 2016 Senator Ferguson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 25
Budget and Taxation
3/01/2016 - 8:30 AM
Appropriations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:51 PM