Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Veterinarians

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0057
Title
Animal Shelters - Standards of Operation
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0114
Title
Agriculture - Animal Shelters - Waiver of Adoption Fee
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0445
Title
Animal Welfare - Declawing Cats - Prohibited Acts
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0512 /CH0230
Title
Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0545 /CH0243 (SB0189/CH0244)
Title
State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners – Cease and Desist Orders and Civil Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0549 /CH0249 (SB0394)
Title
State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0692
Title
Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0863
Title
Natural Resources – Organized Killing Contests – Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0166 /CH0229
Title
Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0189 /CH0244 (HB0545/CH0243)
Title
State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners – Cease and Desist Orders and Civil Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0394 (HB0549/CH0249)
Title
State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0412
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement - Veterinary Care of Retired Law Enforcement K-9s Act
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0057 Animal Shelters - Standards of Operation Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0114 Agriculture - Animal Shelters - Waiver of Adoption Fee Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0445 Animal Welfare - Declawing Cats - Prohibited Acts Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0512 /CH0230 Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances Delegate Barron 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 230
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0545 /CH0243 (SB0189/CH0244) State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners – Cease and Desist Orders and Civil Penalties Delegate Griffith 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 243
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0549 /CH0249 (SB0394) State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 249
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0692 Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0863 Natural Resources – Organized Killing Contests – Restrictions Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0166 /CH0229 Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances Senator Kelley 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 229
Finance
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0189 /CH0244 (HB0545/CH0243) State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners – Cease and Desist Orders and Civil Penalties Senator Gallion 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 244
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0394 (HB0549/CH0249) State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0412 Public Safety - Law Enforcement - Veterinary Care of Retired Law Enforcement K-9s Act Senator Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2020 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/6/2020 2:02 PM