Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Veto

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0370 /CH0353 (SB0279/CH0354)
Title
Metro Board Member Act
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0279 /CH0354 (HB0370/CH0353)
Title
Metro Board Member Act
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0820
Title
State Budget
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0370 /CH0353 (SB0279/CH0354) Metro Board Member Act Delegate Korman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0279 /CH0354 (HB0370/CH0353) Metro Board Member Act Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 354
Finance
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0820 State Budget Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:58 PM