Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Video

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0308
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Video Cameras
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0457
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or Witness
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0471
Title
School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0533 /CH0129 (SB0628)
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Body-Worn Digital Recording Device and Electronic Control Device
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0579
Title
Crimes - Extortion of Sexual Images
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0627 (SB0482/CH0128)
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Body-Worn Cameras
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0866
Title
Wiretapping and Electronic Surveillance - Law Enforcement and Public Transportation - One-Party Consent for Interception of Oral Communications
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1088
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated Expenditures Between Candidates and Outside Spending Organizations
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1241 /CH0122
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Payment of Tolls and Related Fees
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0482 /CH0128 (HB0627)
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Body-Worn Digital Recording Device and Electronic Control Device
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0628 (HB0533/CH0129)
Title
Wiretapping and Electronic Surveillance - Body-Worn Digital Recording Device and Electronic Control Device - Exception
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0308 Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Video Cameras Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0457 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or Witness Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0471 School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil Penalty Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0533 /CH0129 (SB0628) Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Body-Worn Digital Recording Device and Electronic Control Device Delegate Sydnor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129
Judiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0579 Crimes - Extortion of Sexual Images Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0627 (SB0482/CH0128) Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Body-Worn Cameras Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0866 Wiretapping and Electronic Surveillance - Law Enforcement and Public Transportation - One-Party Consent for Interception of Oral Communications Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1088 Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated Expenditures Between Candidates and Outside Spending Organizations Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1241 /CH0122 Maryland Transportation Authority - Payment of Tolls and Related Fees Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0482 /CH0128 (HB0627) Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Body-Worn Digital Recording Device and Electronic Control Device Senator Ramirez 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 128
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0628 (HB0533/CH0129) Wiretapping and Electronic Surveillance - Body-Worn Digital Recording Device and Electronic Control Device - Exception Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM