Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Vital Records

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0009 /CH0393 (SB0105)
Title
Maryland Licensure of Direct-Entry Midwives Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0029
Title
Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of Citizenship
Sponsor
Delegate Schulz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0050 (SB0061/CH0004)
Title
Active Armed Forces Member - Exemption From Payment of Fees for Certain Court Records
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0220 (SB0273)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0439 (SB0685/CH0046)
Title
Family Law - Information and Services for Foster Children and Former Foster Children
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0661 (SB0861)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security Freezes
Sponsor
Delegate Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0862 /CH0485 (SB0743/CH0484)
Title
Vital Records - New Certificates of Birth - Sex Change or Diagnosis of an Intersex Condition
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1011
Title
Health General - Birth Certificates - Issuance of Copies
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1021 (SB0676)
Title
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Death with Dignity Act
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1076
Title
Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of Citizenship
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0061 /CH0004 (HB0050)
Title
Active Armed Forces Member - Exemption From Payment of Fees for Certain Court Records
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0105 (HB0009/CH0393)
Title
Maryland Home Birth Safety Act
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0273 (HB0220)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0676 (HB1021)
Title
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Death With Dignity Act
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0685 /CH0046 (HB0439)
Title
Family Law - Information and Services for Foster Children and Former Foster Children
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0743 /CH0484 (HB0862/CH0485)
Title
Vital Records - New Certificates of Birth - Sex Change or Diagnosis of an Intersex Condition
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0861 (HB0661)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security Freezes
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0009 /CH0393 (SB0105) Maryland Licensure of Direct-Entry Midwives Act Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 393
Health and Government Operations
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0029 Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of Citizenship Delegate Schulz 2 2 In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Ways and Means
HB0050 (SB0061/CH0004) Active Armed Forces Member - Exemption From Payment of Fees for Certain Court Records Chair, Judiciary Committee 6 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Judiciary
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0220 (SB0273) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0439 (SB0685/CH0046) Family Law - Information and Services for Foster Children and Former Foster Children Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Judiciary
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0661 (SB0861) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security Freezes Delegate Zucker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB0862 /CH0485 (SB0743/CH0484) Vital Records - New Certificates of Birth - Sex Change or Diagnosis of an Intersex Condition Delegate Moon 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 485
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1011 Health General - Birth Certificates - Issuance of Copies Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1021 (SB0676) Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Death with Dignity Act Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB1076 Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of Citizenship Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0061 /CH0004 (HB0050) Active Armed Forces Member - Exemption From Payment of Fees for Certain Court Records Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0105 (HB0009/CH0393) Maryland Home Birth Safety Act Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0273 (HB0220) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0676 (HB1021) Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Death With Dignity Act Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0685 /CH0046 (HB0439) Family Law - Information and Services for Foster Children and Former Foster Children Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 46
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0743 /CH0484 (HB0862/CH0485) Vital Records - New Certificates of Birth - Sex Change or Diagnosis of an Intersex Condition Senator Lee 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 484
Finance
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0861 (HB0661) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security Freezes Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM