Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Vital Records

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0280 /CH0453 (SB0931/CH0452)
Title
Birth Certificates - Homeless Individuals - Prohibition on Collection of Fee
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0404 (SB0418)
Title
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0459 /CH0316 (SB0389)
Title
Birth and Death Certificates - Fee Reduction
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0968
Title
Family Law - Collaborative Reproduction - Orders of Parentage
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1099
Title
Vital Records - New Certificates of Birth - Gender Identity
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1390
Title
Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of Citizenship
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0389 (HB0459/CH0316)
Title
Birth and Death Certificates - Fee Reduction
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0418 (HB0404)
Title
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0931 /CH0452 (HB0280/CH0453)
Title
Birth Certificates - Homeless Individuals - Prohibition on Collection of Fee
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1096
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Information Regarding Parents Responsible for Child Abuse or Neglect
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0280 /CH0453 (SB0931/CH0452) Birth Certificates - Homeless Individuals - Prohibition on Collection of Fee Delegate Moon 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 453
Health and Government Operations
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0404 (SB0418) Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0459 /CH0316 (SB0389) Birth and Death Certificates - Fee Reduction Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
Ways and Means
3/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0968 Family Law - Collaborative Reproduction - Orders of Parentage Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1099 Vital Records - New Certificates of Birth - Gender Identity Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1390 Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of Citizenship Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
3/14/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0389 (HB0459/CH0316) Birth and Death Certificates - Fee Reduction President 3 2 In the House - Hearing 4/09 at 9:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/09/2016 - 9:30 AM
Appropriations
SB0418 (HB0404) Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0931 /CH0452 (HB0280/CH0453) Birth Certificates - Homeless Individuals - Prohibition on Collection of Fee Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452
Finance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1096 Child Abuse and Neglect - Information Regarding Parents Responsible for Child Abuse or Neglect Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:51 PM