Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Vital Records

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0370 (SB0354)
Title
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0539
Title
Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of Citizenship
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0618
Title
Vital Records - Birth, Death, and Fetal Death Certificates - Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1602
Title
Public Health - Vital Records - Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1632 /CH0011 (SB1174)
Title
Public Health - Certificates of Birth - Births Outside an Institution
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0354 (HB0370)
Title
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1174 (HB1632/CH0011)
Title
Public Health - Certificates of Birth - Births Outside an Institution
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0370 (SB0354) Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0539 Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of Citizenship Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0618 Vital Records - Birth, Death, and Fetal Death Certificates - Fees Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1602 Public Health - Vital Records - Fees Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1632 /CH0011 (SB1174) Public Health - Certificates of Birth - Births Outside an Institution Delegate Kipke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 11
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0354 (HB0370) Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB1174 (HB1632/CH0011) Public Health - Certificates of Birth - Births Outside an Institution Senator Jennings 2 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:53 PM