Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Vital Records

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0247 (SB0445)
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Surgical Birth Rate - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0373
Title
Family Law - Paternity and Birth Certificates
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0399 (SB0311)
Title
End-of-Life Option Act (Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0519 /CH0438 (SB0697/CH0437)
Title
Family Law - Parentage and Adoption
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0796 /CH0448 (SB0602)
Title
Public Health - Maternal Mortality Review Program - Establishment of Local Teams
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0860 (SB0828/CH0208)
Title
Employees', Teachers', and Correctional Officers' Systems - Active Members - Death Benefits
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1005 (SB0905)
Title
Action for Change of Name - Procedures and Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1400 /CH0558 (SB1012)
Title
Public Health - Death Certificates - Completion and Cause of Death Report
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0311 (HB0399)
Title
End-of-Life Option Act (Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Act)
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0445 (HB0247)
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Surgical Birth Rate - Study
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0543 /CH0759
Title
Health – Vital Records – Health Information Exchange Data Access and Security Protocols and Protections
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0602 (HB0796/CH0448)
Title
Public Health - Maternal Mortality Review Program - Establishment of Local Teams
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0697 /CH0437 (HB0519/CH0438)
Title
Family Law - Parentage and Adoption
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0828 /CH0208 (HB0860)
Title
Employees', Teachers', and Correctional Officers' Systems - Active Members - Death Benefits
Sponsor
Senator Griffith
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0905 (HB1005)
Title
Action for Change of Name - Procedures and Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0962
Title
Correctional Services - Offender Rehabilitation and Reentry Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1012 (HB1400/CH0558)
Title
Public Health - Death Certificates - Completion and Cause of Death Report
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0247 (SB0445) Maryland Health Care Commission - Surgical Birth Rate - Study Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0373 Family Law - Paternity and Birth Certificates Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0399 (SB0311) End-of-Life Option Act (Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Act) Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2019 - 1:30 PM
Judiciary
2/15/2019 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0519 /CH0438 (SB0697/CH0437) Family Law - Parentage and Adoption Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 438
Judiciary
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
HB0796 /CH0448 (SB0602) Public Health - Maternal Mortality Review Program - Establishment of Local Teams Delegate Wilkins 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0860 (SB0828/CH0208) Employees', Teachers', and Correctional Officers' Systems - Active Members - Death Benefits Delegate Barnes, B. 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1005 (SB0905) Action for Change of Name - Procedures and Requirements Delegate Shetty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Judiciary
2/20/2019 - 11:00 AM
HB1400 /CH0558 (SB1012) Public Health - Death Certificates - Completion and Cause of Death Report Delegate Cardin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 558
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0311 (HB0399) End-of-Life Option Act (Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Act) Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Failed
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0445 (HB0247) Maryland Health Care Commission - Surgical Birth Rate - Study Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0543 /CH0759 Health – Vital Records – Health Information Exchange Data Access and Security Protocols and Protections Senator Lam 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 759
Finance
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0602 (HB0796/CH0448) Public Health - Maternal Mortality Review Program - Establishment of Local Teams Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0697 /CH0437 (HB0519/CH0438) Family Law - Parentage and Adoption Senator Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 437
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0828 /CH0208 (HB0860) Employees', Teachers', and Correctional Officers' Systems - Active Members - Death Benefits Senator Griffith 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 208
Budget and Taxation
2/28/2019 - 8:30 AM
Appropriations
SB0905 (HB1005) Action for Change of Name - Procedures and Requirements Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB0962 Correctional Services - Offender Rehabilitation and Reentry Program - Establishment Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB1012 (HB1400/CH0558) Public Health - Death Certificates - Completion and Cause of Death Report Senator Feldman 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM