Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Vital Records

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0055 (SB0998)
Title
Vessels - Certificate of Title - Transfer-on-Death Beneficiary Designation
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0850
Title
Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Transfer of Student Data - Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1019 (SB0529)
Title
Public Service Commission - Electric Companies and Electric Cooperatives - Customer Identification
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1039 (SB0743)
Title
Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1133 (SB0869)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Maryland Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1179
Title
Public Health - Unborn Human Beings and Infants (Humane Disposition of Human Remains Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1209 (SB0848)
Title
Public Safety - DNA Collection, Records, Analysis, and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1231 (SB0949)
Title
Family Law – Authorization for a Minor to Marry
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1463
Title
Correctional Services - Inmates - Intake and Release Requirements (Reentry Success Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1635 (SB1062)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Birth Registration - Gestational Carriers
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0077 /CH0514 (HB1553)
Title
Important Documents and Identification Cards – Inmates
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0102 /CH0526
Title
Vital Records - Birth Certificates - Change of Name of Child
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0529 (HB1019)
Title
Public Service Commission - Electric Companies and Electric Cooperatives - Customer Identification
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0628 /CH0570
Title
Utilities - Surviving Spouse of Account Holder - Protections
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0743 (HB1039)
Title
Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0848 (HB1209)
Title
Public Safety - DNA Collection, Records, Analysis, and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0869 (HB1133)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Maryland Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0949 (HB1231)
Title
Family Law – Authorization for a Minor to Marry
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0998 (HB0055)
Title
Vessels - Certificate of Title - Transfer-on-Death Beneficiary Designation
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0055 (SB0998) Vessels - Certificate of Title - Transfer-on-Death Beneficiary Designation Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
1/29/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB0850 Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Transfer of Student Data - Modifications Delegate Smith 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1019 (SB0529) Public Service Commission - Electric Companies and Electric Cooperatives - Customer Identification Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB1039 (SB0743) Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services Delegate Malone 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1133 (SB0869) Estates and Trusts - Maryland Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act - Revisions Delegate Shetty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1179 Public Health - Unborn Human Beings and Infants (Humane Disposition of Human Remains Act) Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1209 (SB0848) Public Safety - DNA Collection, Records, Analysis, and Reporting Delegate Shetty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1231 (SB0949) Family Law – Authorization for a Minor to Marry Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1463 Correctional Services - Inmates - Intake and Release Requirements (Reentry Success Act of 2020) Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1635 (SB1062) Maryland Department of Health - Birth Registration - Gestational Carriers Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled (Judiciary) and Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Judiciary
Health and Government Operations
SB0077 /CH0514 (HB1553) Important Documents and Identification Cards – Inmates Senator Ellis 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 514
Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2020 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0102 /CH0526 Vital Records - Birth Certificates - Change of Name of Child Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 526
Finance
1/23/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2020 - 11:00 AM
SB0529 (HB1019) Public Service Commission - Electric Companies and Electric Cooperatives - Customer Identification Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0628 /CH0570 Utilities - Surviving Spouse of Account Holder - Protections Senator Kagan 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 570
Finance
2/21/2020 - 12:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0743 (HB1039) Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0848 (HB1209) Public Safety - DNA Collection, Records, Analysis, and Reporting Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0869 (HB1133) Estates and Trusts - Maryland Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act - Revisions Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2020 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0949 (HB1231) Family Law – Authorization for a Minor to Marry Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0998 (HB0055) Vessels - Certificate of Title - Transfer-on-Death Beneficiary Designation Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:28 PM