Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Vocational Rehabilitation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0048 /CH0605 (SB1066/CH0343)
Title
Minority Business Enterprises - Not-for-Profit Entities
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0516
Title
Office of Legislative Audits - Fiscal/Compliance Audits - Blind Industries and Services of Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0841 (SB0638)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - St. Luke's House Renovation Project
Sponsor
Delegate Gutierrez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0992
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2006 - St. Mary's County - Pathway's Facility Renovation
Sponsor
Delegate Bohanan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1023
Title
Public Ethics - Blind Industries and Services of Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0638 (HB0841)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - St. Luke's House Renovation Project
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0934 (HB1372/CH0430)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1066 /CH0343 (HB0048/CH0605)
Title
Minority Business Enterprises - Not-for-Profit Entities
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0048 /CH0605 (SB1066/CH0343) Minority Business Enterprises - Not-for-Profit Entities Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 605
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0516 Office of Legislative Audits - Fiscal/Compliance Audits - Blind Industries and Services of Maryland Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB0841 (SB0638) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - St. Luke's House Renovation Project Delegate Gutierrez 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2013 - 10:00 AM
HB0992 Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2006 - St. Mary's County - Pathway's Facility Renovation Delegate Bohanan 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1023 Public Ethics - Blind Industries and Services of Maryland Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Delegate Jones 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0638 (HB0841) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - St. Luke's House Renovation Project Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2013 - 11:00 AM
SB0934 (HB1372/CH0430) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1066 /CH0343 (HB0048/CH0605) Minority Business Enterprises - Not-for-Profit Entities Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 343
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM