Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Vocational Rehabilitation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087 (SB0871)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1184 (SB0191)
Title
Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined or Whose Conviction or Adjudication Is Reversed
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0075
Title
Juvenile Services Education Program - Employees - Employment Contracts and Leave
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0191 (HB1184)
Title
Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined or Whose Conviction or Adjudication Is Reversed
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0264
Title
General Provisions - Age of Majority - Right to Parental Support and Maintenance
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871 (HB1087)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1044
Title
Labor and Employment - Motor Vehicle Repair and Career Certification Program for Ex-Offenders
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1087 (SB0871) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1184 (SB0191) Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined or Whose Conviction or Adjudication Is Reversed Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0075 Juvenile Services Education Program - Employees - Employment Contracts and Leave Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 2:30 p.m.
Finance
1/24/2019 - 2:30 PM
SB0191 (HB1184) Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined or Whose Conviction or Adjudication Is Reversed Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0264 General Provisions - Age of Majority - Right to Parental Support and Maintenance Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0871 (HB1087) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB1044 Labor and Employment - Motor Vehicle Repair and Career Certification Program for Ex-Offenders Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM