Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Volunteers -see also- Maryland Service Corps

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0224 /CH0826
Title
Higher Education - AmeriCorps Program Participants - In-State Tuition
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0301 (SB0482)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - White Marsh Volunteer Fire Company
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0601 /CH0673 (SB0248)
Title
Senior Call-Check Service and Notification Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0822 /CH0155
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Police Auxiliaries and Reserve Volunteers
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0979 /CH0686
Title
Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1084 (SB1104)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1195
Title
High School Graduation Requirements - Student Service - Fire Fighting Training and Volunteer Hours
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1267
Title
Workers' Compensation - Members of Volunteer Company - Computation of Average Weekly Wage
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1646 (SB1078)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Lutheran Mission Society Compassion Centers
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0070 /CH0262
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Youth Sports Workers
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0258
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Police Auxiliaries or Reserve Volunteers
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0482 (HB0301)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - White Marsh Volunteer Fire Company
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1104 (HB1084)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1130
Title
Health Insurance - Volunteer Emergency Responders - Benefits Under Blanket Policies and Contracts
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0224 /CH0826 Higher Education - AmeriCorps Program Participants - In-State Tuition Delegate Lierman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 826
Appropriations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0301 (SB0482) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - White Marsh Volunteer Fire Company Delegate Miele 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 12:00 PM
HB0601 /CH0673 (SB0248) Senior Call-Check Service and Notification Program - Establishment Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 673
Economic Matters
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0822 /CH0155 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Police Auxiliaries and Reserve Volunteers Delegate Kipke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155
Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0979 /CH0686 Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officers Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 686
Ways and Means
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1084 (SB1104) Income Tax Credit - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1195 High School Graduation Requirements - Student Service - Fire Fighting Training and Volunteer Hours Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB1267 Workers' Compensation - Members of Volunteer Company - Computation of Average Weekly Wage Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1646 (SB1078) Creation of a State Debt - Lutheran Mission Society Compassion Centers Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 9:00 AM
SB0070 /CH0262 Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Youth Sports Workers Senator Waugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Finance
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0258 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Police Auxiliaries or Reserve Volunteers Senator Astle 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/08/2017 - 2:20 PM
SB0482 (HB0301) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - White Marsh Volunteer Fire Company Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 9:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 9:00 AM
SB1104 (HB1084) Income Tax Credit - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1130 Health Insurance - Volunteer Emergency Responders - Benefits Under Blanket Policies and Contracts Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:54 PM