Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Volunteers -see also- Maryland Service Corps

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0120 /CH0064 (SB0171/CH0065)
Title
Motor Carriers and For-Hire Driving Services - Nonprofit Organizations and Volunteer Drivers
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0121 /CH0066
Title
St. Mary’s County – Metropolitan Commission – Collection of Fees, Assessments, and Nonsubstantive and Clarifying Revisions
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0130 (SB0319)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Move Over Safety Monitoring System - Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0201
Title
Immunities - Associations, Organizations, and Charities - Liability of Agents and Volunteers
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0202
Title
Restorative Schools Fund and Grants - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Cain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0562
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services Personnel (First Responders Tax Benefit Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0578
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Participation in Program - Volunteer First Responders
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0777 /CH0322 (SB0792/CH0323)
Title
Kent County Alcohol Act of 2020
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0798
Title
Montgomery County - Property Tax - Credit for Senior Citizen Volunteers MC 23-20
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0810 /CH0332
Title
Workers' Compensation - Washington County - Volunteer Company - Fire and Rescue Academy Student
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1282
Title
Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1468
Title
Education - Student Behavior - Parent Notice and Required Counseling (Parent Accountability Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1652
Title
Maryland Sign Language Interpreter Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0023 /CH0501
Title
Business Regulation - Trademarks, Service Marks, and Trade Names - Registration
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0171 /CH0065 (HB0120/CH0064)
Title
Motor Carriers and For-Hire Driving Services - Nonprofit Organizations and Volunteer Drivers
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0186 /CH0074 (HB0141/CH0073)
Title
Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Corporation Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0319 (HB0130)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Move Over Safety Monitoring System - Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0792 /CH0323 (HB0777/CH0322)
Title
Kent County Alcohol Act of 2020
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0853 (HB1595)
Title
Education - Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1020
Title
Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officer - Volunteer Auxiliary and Volunteer Reserve Police Officers
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1081 /CH0595
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0120 /CH0064 (SB0171/CH0065) Motor Carriers and For-Hire Driving Services - Nonprofit Organizations and Volunteer Drivers Delegate Dumais 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 64
Economic Matters
1/30/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0121 /CH0066 St. Mary’s County – Metropolitan Commission – Collection of Fees, Assessments, and Nonsubstantive and Clarifying Revisions St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 66
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0130 (SB0319) Vehicle Laws - Move Over Safety Monitoring System - Authorization Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0201 Immunities - Associations, Organizations, and Charities - Liability of Agents and Volunteers Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0202 Restorative Schools Fund and Grants - Establishment Delegate Cain 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/30/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0562 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services Personnel (First Responders Tax Benefit Act) Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0578 State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Participation in Program - Volunteer First Responders Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB0777 /CH0322 (SB0792/CH0323) Kent County Alcohol Act of 2020 Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 322
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0798 Montgomery County - Property Tax - Credit for Senior Citizen Volunteers MC 23-20 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0810 /CH0332 Workers' Compensation - Washington County - Volunteer Company - Fire and Rescue Academy Student Delegate Wivell 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 332
Economic Matters
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1282 Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1468 Education - Student Behavior - Parent Notice and Required Counseling (Parent Accountability Act) Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1652 Maryland Sign Language Interpreter Act Delegate Kittleman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0023 /CH0501 Business Regulation - Trademarks, Service Marks, and Trade Names - Registration Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 501
Finance
1/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0171 /CH0065 (HB0120/CH0064) Motor Carriers and For-Hire Driving Services - Nonprofit Organizations and Volunteer Drivers Senator Guzzone 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 65
Finance
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0186 /CH0074 (HB0141/CH0073) Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Corporation Act - Revisions Senator Kelley 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 74
Finance
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0319 (HB0130) Vehicle Laws - Move Over Safety Monitoring System - Authorization Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0792 /CH0323 (HB0777/CH0322) Kent County Alcohol Act of 2020 Senator Hershey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 323
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0853 (HB1595) Education - Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB1020 Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officer - Volunteer Auxiliary and Volunteer Reserve Police Officers Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
SB1081 /CH0595 Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations Senator Peters 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 595
Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:21 PM