Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Volunteers -see also- Maryland Service Corps

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0055
Title
Immunities – Associations, Organizations, and Charities – Liability of Agents and Volunteers
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0085 (SB0651)
Title
Baltimore County - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Detention and Correctional Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Bhandari
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0223
Title
Criminal Law – Person in a Position of Authority – Sexual Offenses With a Minor
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0246 (SB0554)
Title
Higher Education - Returned Peace Corps Volunteers - In-State Tuition
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0370 (SB0225)
Title
Education - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Seizure Action Plans (Brynleigh's Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0535 (SB0431)
Title
Maryland Sign Language Interpreter Act
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0765
Title
Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – Novel Coronavirus (Essential Workers’ Compensation Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0782 (SB0934)
Title
Public Schools - Purple Star Schools Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0888 (SB0620)
Title
Income Tax – Subtraction Modification for Volunteer Fire, Rescue, or Emergency Medical Services Members – Active Status Points
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1199 (SB0813)
Title
Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – COVID–19
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1247 (SB0725)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - COVID-19
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0225 (HB0370)
Title
Education - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Seizure Action Plans (Brynleigh's Act)
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0431 (HB0535)
Title
Maryland Sign Language Interpreter Act
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0554 (HB0246)
Title
Higher Education - Returned Peace Corps Volunteers - In-State Tuition
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0620 (HB0888)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification for Volunteer Fire, Rescue, or Emergency Medical Services Members - Active Status Points
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0651 (HB0085)
Title
Baltimore County - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Detention and Correctional Officers
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0725 (HB1247)
Title
Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – COVID–19
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0756
Title
Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – COVID–19
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0812
Title
Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - COVID-19
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0813 (HB1199)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - COVID-19
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0872
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0934 (HB0782)
Title
Public Schools - Purple Star Schools Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0055 Immunities – Associations, Organizations, and Charities – Liability of Agents and Volunteers Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
1/15/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0085 (SB0651) Baltimore County - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Detention and Correctional Officers Delegate Bhandari 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0223 Criminal Law – Person in a Position of Authority – Sexual Offenses With a Minor Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0246 (SB0554) Higher Education - Returned Peace Corps Volunteers - In-State Tuition Delegate Hill 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Appropriations
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0370 (SB0225) Education - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Seizure Action Plans (Brynleigh's Act) Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0535 (SB0431) Maryland Sign Language Interpreter Act Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0765 Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – Novel Coronavirus (Essential Workers’ Compensation Act) Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB0782 (SB0934) Public Schools - Purple Star Schools Program - Establishment Delegate Patterson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0888 (SB0620) Income Tax – Subtraction Modification for Volunteer Fire, Rescue, or Emergency Medical Services Members – Active Status Points Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1199 (SB0813) Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – COVID–19 Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1247 (SB0725) Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - COVID-19 Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0225 (HB0370) Education - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Seizure Action Plans (Brynleigh's Act) Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/20 at 3:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2021 - 3:00 PM
SB0431 (HB0535) Maryland Sign Language Interpreter Act Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0554 (HB0246) Higher Education - Returned Peace Corps Volunteers - In-State Tuition Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0620 (HB0888) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification for Volunteer Fire, Rescue, or Emergency Medical Services Members - Active Status Points Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0651 (HB0085) Baltimore County - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Detention and Correctional Officers Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0725 (HB1247) Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – COVID–19 Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0756 Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – COVID–19 Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0812 Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - COVID-19 Senator Klausmeier 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0813 (HB1199) Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - COVID-19 Senator Klausmeier 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0872 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services Senator Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0934 (HB0782) Public Schools - Purple Star Schools Program - Establishment Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/2/2021 12:32 PM
Click to return on the top page