Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Vulnerable Adults -see also- Developmental Disabilities; Eld

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0015 (SB0079)
Title
Family Law - Destitute Adults - Extraordinary Medical Expenses for Developmental Disabilities and Civil Action
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0228 (SB0546)
Title
Environment - Water Service - Shutoff Notice Disclosures and Vulnerable Population Protection
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0233 /CH0166 (SB0666/CH0165)
Title
Disclosure of Medical Records - Guardian Ad Litem - Victims of Crime or Delinquent Acts
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0256
Title
Adult Protective Services - Investigation - Time Period Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0601 /CH0673 (SB0248)
Title
Senior Call-Check Service and Notification Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0764 /CH0541 (SB0676/CH0540)
Title
Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0818 (SB0673)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - National Center on Institutions and Alternatives Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1149 /CH0837 (SB0951/CH0838)
Title
Maryland Securities Act - Vulnerable Adults
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1165
Title
Estates - Duties of Guardian of the Person - Fostering and Preserving Family Relationships
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0047 /CH0207
Title
Reporting Abuse to the Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program and the Office of Health Care Quality
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0079 (HB0015)
Title
Family Law - Destitute Adults - Extraordinary Medical Expenses for Developmental Disabilities and Civil Action
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0248 (HB0601/CH0673)
Title
Senior Call-Check Service and Notification Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0408
Title
Senior Apartment Facilities - Limitation on Occupancy by Person Convicted of Crime of Violence
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0532
Title
Temporary Family Health Care Structures - Permits
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0546 (HB0228)
Title
Environment - Water Service - Shutoff Notice Disclosures and Vulnerable Population Protection
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0666 /CH0165 (HB0233/CH0166)
Title
Disclosure of Medical Records - Guardian Ad Litem - Victims of Crime or Delinquent Acts
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0673 (HB0818)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - National Center on Institutions and Alternatives Expansion
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0676 /CH0540 (HB0764/CH0541)
Title
Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0680 /CH0605
Title
Adult Protective Services Investigations - Completion Time
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0774
Title
Criminal Procedure - Petition for Expungement
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0951 /CH0838 (HB1149/CH0837)
Title
Maryland Securities Act - Vulnerable Adults
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0015 (SB0079) Family Law - Destitute Adults - Extraordinary Medical Expenses for Developmental Disabilities and Civil Action Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/19/2017 - 3:00 PM
HB0228 (SB0546) Environment - Water Service - Shutoff Notice Disclosures and Vulnerable Population Protection Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0233 /CH0166 (SB0666/CH0165) Disclosure of Medical Records - Guardian Ad Litem - Victims of Crime or Delinquent Acts Delegate Barron 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 166
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0256 Adult Protective Services - Investigation - Time Period Increase Delegate Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0601 /CH0673 (SB0248) Senior Call-Check Service and Notification Program - Establishment Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 673
Economic Matters
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0764 /CH0541 (SB0676/CH0540) Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal Delegate West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 541
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0818 (SB0673) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - National Center on Institutions and Alternatives Expansion Delegate Jones 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/13/2017 - 11:30 AM
HB1149 /CH0837 (SB0951/CH0838) Maryland Securities Act - Vulnerable Adults Delegate Kramer 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 837
Economic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1165 Estates - Duties of Guardian of the Person - Fostering and Preserving Family Relationships Delegate Saab 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0047 /CH0207 Reporting Abuse to the Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program and the Office of Health Care Quality Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Finance
1/19/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0079 (HB0015) Family Law - Destitute Adults - Extraordinary Medical Expenses for Developmental Disabilities and Civil Action Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0248 (HB0601/CH0673) Senior Call-Check Service and Notification Program - Establishment Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0408 Senior Apartment Facilities - Limitation on Occupancy by Person Convicted of Crime of Violence Senator Robinson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0532 Temporary Family Health Care Structures - Permits Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0546 (HB0228) Environment - Water Service - Shutoff Notice Disclosures and Vulnerable Population Protection Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0666 /CH0165 (HB0233/CH0166) Disclosure of Medical Records - Guardian Ad Litem - Victims of Crime or Delinquent Acts Senator Hough 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 165
Finance
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0673 (HB0818) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - National Center on Institutions and Alternatives Expansion Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2017 - 10:00 AM
SB0676 /CH0540 (HB0764/CH0541) Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 540
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0680 /CH0605 Adult Protective Services Investigations - Completion Time Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 605
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0774 Criminal Procedure - Petition for Expungement Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0951 /CH0838 (HB1149/CH0837) Maryland Securities Act - Vulnerable Adults Senator Smith 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 838
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:54 PM