Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Vulnerable Adults -see also- Developmental Disabilities; Eld

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0142
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Road User - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0956
Title
Civil Action - Offense Against Vulnerable or Elderly Adult
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1392 (SB0864/CH0682)
Title
Health – Emergency Evaluees and Involuntarily Admitted or Committed Individuals – Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1462 (SB0701)
Title
Commercial Driver's Licenses - Recognition, Prevention, and Reporting of Human Trafficking
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1483 /CH0287
Title
Duties of a Guardian of the Person - Visitation
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0214
Title
Task Force to Study the Need for Enhanced Monitoring of Guardians of Vulnerable Adults
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0386 /CH0454
Title
Maryland Nursing Home Resident Protection Act of 2018
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0701 (HB1462)
Title
Commercial Driver's Licenses - Recognition, Prevention, and Reporting of Human Trafficking
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0864 /CH0682 (HB1392)
Title
Health – Emergency Evaluees and Involuntarily Admitted or Committed Individuals – Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0142 Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Road User - Penalties Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0956 Civil Action - Offense Against Vulnerable or Elderly Adult Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1392 (SB0864/CH0682) Health – Emergency Evaluees and Involuntarily Admitted or Committed Individuals – Procedures Delegate Lam 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1462 (SB0701) Commercial Driver's Licenses - Recognition, Prevention, and Reporting of Human Trafficking Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1483 /CH0287 Duties of a Guardian of the Person - Visitation Delegate Saab 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0214 Task Force to Study the Need for Enhanced Monitoring of Guardians of Vulnerable Adults Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0386 /CH0454 Maryland Nursing Home Resident Protection Act of 2018 Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Finance
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0701 (HB1462) Commercial Driver's Licenses - Recognition, Prevention, and Reporting of Human Trafficking Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0864 /CH0682 (HB1392) Health – Emergency Evaluees and Involuntarily Admitted or Committed Individuals – Procedures Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 682
Finance
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/04/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:58 PM