Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Warrants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0408 (SB0477)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - Citation
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0739 /CH0802 (SB0941/CH0803)
Title
Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1362 (SB0835)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Immigration - Community Trust
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1375 /CH0486 (SB0781/CH0485)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Testing - HIV and Hepatitis C
Sponsor
Delegate Proctor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1407
Title
Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Full Names
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1526 /CH0622 (SB0934)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Postsentencing - Victim Notification
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0477 (HB0408)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - Citation
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0781 /CH0485 (HB1375/CH0486)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Testing - HIV and Hepatitis C
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0835 (HB1362)
Title
Maryland Law Enforcement and Governmental Trust Act
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0934 (HB1526/CH0622)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Postsentencing - Victim Notification
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0941 /CH0803 (HB0739/CH0802)
Title
Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Standards
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0408 (SB0477) Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - Citation Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0739 /CH0802 (SB0941/CH0803) Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Standards Delegate Moon 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 802
Judiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1362 (SB0835) Criminal Procedure - Immigration - Community Trust Delegate Morales 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1375 /CH0486 (SB0781/CH0485) Criminal Procedure - Testing - HIV and Hepatitis C Delegate Proctor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 486
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1407 Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Full Names Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1526 /CH0622 (SB0934) Criminal Procedure - Postsentencing - Victim Notification Delegate Angel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 622
Judiciary
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0477 (HB0408) Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - Citation Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0781 /CH0485 (HB1375/CH0486) Criminal Procedure - Testing - HIV and Hepatitis C Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 485
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0835 (HB1362) Maryland Law Enforcement and Governmental Trust Act Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0934 (HB1526/CH0622) Criminal Procedure - Postsentencing - Victim Notification Senator Smith 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0941 /CH0803 (HB0739/CH0802) Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Standards Senator Smith 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 803
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:54 PM