Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Warrants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0056
Title
Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Utility Meters
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0323 (SB0248)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - Citation
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0385
Title
Criminal Procedure - Incompetency and Criminal Responsibility
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0545
Title
Landlord-Tenant Action - Body Attachment - Prohibition (Jared Kushner Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Ali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0887
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Specific Individuals or Mass Murder
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0920 (SB0705)
Title
Public Safety - SWAT Team Activation and Deployment - Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0942
Title
Real Property – Body Attachments – Debt Related to Residential Tenancy
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1023 /CH0783 (SB0861)
Title
Juvenile Law – Witnesses – Body Attachment
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1081 (SB1050)
Title
Civil Actions – Body Attachment – Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1383 (SB1212)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Expansion (Maryland Record Expungement Designed to Enhance Employment (REDEEM) Act of 2018)
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1461
Title
Criminal Procedure – Immigration – Supporting All Families Everywhere (SAFE Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Gutierrez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1520 (SB0766)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Services Program - Victim Notification
Sponsor
Delegate Vallario
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1559
Title
Court Records - Unserved Arrest Warrant and Charging Document - Inspection by Attorney
Sponsor
Delegate Vallario
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1646 /CH0251 (SB1036)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1726
Title
Maryland Dentistry Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0248 (HB0323)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - Citation
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0442
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Electronic Telecommunications Enforcement Resource System - Body Attachments
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0705 (HB0920)
Title
Public Safety - SWAT Team Activation and Deployment - Reports
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0766 (HB1520)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Services Program - Victim Notification
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0816
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0861 (HB1023/CH0783)
Title
Juvenile Law - Witnesses - Body Attachment
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1034
Title
Human Services – State Public Assistance Eligibility – Arrest Warrant
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1050 (HB1081)
Title
Civil Actions - Body Attachment - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1210
Title
Criminal Procedure - Extradition - Duty of Local Governments (Sanctuary for Citizens Act)
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1212 (HB1383)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Expansion (Maryland Record Expungement Designed to Enhance Employment (REDEEM) Act of 2018)
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0056 Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Utility Meters Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0323 (SB0248) Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - Citation Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0385 Criminal Procedure - Incompetency and Criminal Responsibility Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0545 Landlord-Tenant Action - Body Attachment - Prohibition (Jared Kushner Act) Delegate Ali 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0887 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Specific Individuals or Mass Murder Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0920 (SB0705) Public Safety - SWAT Team Activation and Deployment - Reports Delegate Miele 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0942 Real Property – Body Attachments – Debt Related to Residential Tenancy Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB1023 /CH0783 (SB0861) Juvenile Law – Witnesses – Body Attachment Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 783
Judiciary
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1081 (SB1050) Civil Actions – Body Attachment – Procedures Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1383 (SB1212) Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Expansion (Maryland Record Expungement Designed to Enhance Employment (REDEEM) Act of 2018) Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1461 Criminal Procedure – Immigration – Supporting All Families Everywhere (SAFE Act) Delegate Gutierrez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1520 (SB0766) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Services Program - Victim Notification Delegate Vallario 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1559 Court Records - Unserved Arrest Warrant and Charging Document - Inspection by Attorney Delegate Vallario 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1646 /CH0251 (SB1036) Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 251
Judiciary
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1726 Maryland Dentistry Act - Revisions Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0248 (HB0323) Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - Citation Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/01/2018 - 2:00 PM
SB0442 Public Safety - Maryland Electronic Telecommunications Enforcement Resource System - Body Attachments Senator Norman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0705 (HB0920) Public Safety - SWAT Team Activation and Deployment - Reports Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0766 (HB1520) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Services Program - Victim Notification Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2018 - 3:00 PM
SB0816 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0861 (HB1023/CH0783) Juvenile Law - Witnesses - Body Attachment Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1034 Human Services – State Public Assistance Eligibility – Arrest Warrant Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1050 (HB1081) Civil Actions - Body Attachment - Procedures Senator Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1210 Criminal Procedure - Extradition - Duty of Local Governments (Sanctuary for Citizens Act) Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1212 (HB1383) Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Expansion (Maryland Record Expungement Designed to Enhance Employment (REDEEM) Act of 2018) Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:58 PM