Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Warranties

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1139 (SB0886)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Relationship with Dealers
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1141
Title
Condominiums - Warranty Claims
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1215 /CH0408
Title
Consumer Protection - Home Appliances and Warranty Enforcement - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0167
Title
Residential Condominiums - Governing Documents - Claims Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0886 (HB1139)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Relationship with Dealers
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1139 (SB0886) Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Relationship with Dealers Delegate Frush 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1141 Condominiums - Warranty Claims Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1215 /CH0408 Consumer Protection - Home Appliances and Warranty Enforcement - Study Delegate Walker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 408
Economic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0167 Residential Condominiums - Governing Documents - Claims Provisions Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0886 (HB1139) Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Relationship with Dealers Senator Stone 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM
Click to return on the top page