Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Warranties

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0525 /CH0720 (SB0730)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0982 (SB0666)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1170 (SB0250)
Title
Condominiums - Warranty Claims
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0250 (HB1170)
Title
Condominiums - Warranty Claims
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0666 (HB0982)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0730 (HB0525/CH0720)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0525 /CH0720 (SB0730) Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers Delegate Beidle 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 720
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0982 (SB0666) Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1170 (SB0250) Condominiums - Warranty Claims Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0250 (HB1170) Condominiums - Warranty Claims Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0666 (HB0982) Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0730 (HB0525/CH0720) Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers Senator Norman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:51 PM