Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Warranties

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0077 /CH0346 (SB0258/CH0347)
Title
Condominiums - Claims Against Developers and Vendors - Unenforceability of Certain Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0434 (SB0529)
Title
Vehicle Manufacturers - Notice to Purchasers and Lessees - Warranty Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1104 /CH0517
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers - Consumer Data Protection
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0258 /CH0347 (HB0077/CH0346)
Title
Condominiums – Claims Against Developers and Vendors – Unenforceability of Certain Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0529 (HB0434)
Title
Vehicle Manufacturers - Notice to Purchasers and Lessees - Warranty Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1031
Title
Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Consumer Data Protection
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0077 /CH0346 (SB0258/CH0347) Condominiums - Claims Against Developers and Vendors - Unenforceability of Certain Provisions Delegate Holmes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346
Environment and Transportation
1/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0434 (SB0529) Vehicle Manufacturers - Notice to Purchasers and Lessees - Warranty Requirements Delegate Davis 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments
Economic Matters
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1104 /CH0517 Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers - Consumer Data Protection Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 517
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0258 /CH0347 (HB0077/CH0346) Condominiums – Claims Against Developers and Vendors – Unenforceability of Certain Provisions Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 347
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0529 (HB0434) Vehicle Manufacturers - Notice to Purchasers and Lessees - Warranty Requirements Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Finance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1031 Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Consumer Data Protection Senator Hough 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:58 PM