Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Warranties

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0227 (SB0176)
Title
Wicomico County - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1064 /CH0417 (SB0813/CH0418)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Transfers of Franchises
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1070
Title
Maryland Condominium Act - Implied Warranties From Developers - Common Amenities
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0813 /CH0418 (HB1064/CH0417)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Transfers of Franchises
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0227 (SB0176) Wicomico County - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1064 /CH0417 (SB0813/CH0418) Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Transfers of Franchises Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 417
Economic Matters
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1070 Maryland Condominium Act - Implied Warranties From Developers - Common Amenities Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0813 /CH0418 (HB1064/CH0417) Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Transfers of Franchises Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 418
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2020 - 12:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/8/2020 3:43 PM