Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Washington County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0253 (SB0535/CH0495)
Title
Washington County - Amusement Devices - Tip Jars
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 /CH0119
Title
Local Government Article
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0546 (SB0508/CH0060)
Title
Washington County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0551 /CH0489 (SB0506/CH0488)
Title
Washington County - Technology-Related Businesses - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0559 /CH0048 (SB0408/CH0047)
Title
Washington County - Special Deputy Sheriffs
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0720 /CH0558 (SB0814/CH0557)
Title
Washington County - Salary Study Commission - Updating Salary and Expense Provisions
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0792 /CH0059 (SB0507/CH0058)
Title
Correctional Facilities - Inmate Programs in Washington County - Payment of Child Support
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1060
Title
Washington County - Polling Places - Electioneering Boundaries
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1366
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class CS Chain Store Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1450
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Washington County - Antietam Fire Company Renovations
Sponsor
Delegate Donoghue
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1451
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Washington County - Municipal Electric Light Plant Project
Sponsor
Delegate Donoghue
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1511 (SB1042)
Title
Washington County Building Code Board of Appeals - Decisions
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0299
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Washington County - Lockhouse 44, Lock 44, and Western MD Railroad Lift Bridge
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0408 /CH0047 (HB0559/CH0048)
Title
Washington County - Special Deputy Sheriffs
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0506 /CH0488 (HB0551/CH0489)
Title
Washington County - Technology-Related Businesses - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0507 /CH0058 (HB0792/CH0059)
Title
Correctional Facilities - Inmate Programs in Washington County - Payment of Child Support
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0508 /CH0060 (HB0546)
Title
Washington County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0535 /CH0495 (HB0253)
Title
Washington County - Amusement Devices - Tip Jars
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0789
Title
Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise Participation
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0814 /CH0557 (HB0720/CH0558)
Title
Washington County - Salary Study Commission - Updating Salary and Expense Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0934 (HB1372/CH0430)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1042 (HB1511)
Title
Washington County Building Code Board of Appeals - Decisions
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0253 (SB0535/CH0495) Washington County - Amusement Devices - Tip Jars Washington County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Ways and Means
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:15 PM
HB0472 /CH0119 Local Government Article Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0546 (SB0508/CH0060) Washington County - Public Facilities Bonds Washington County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:15 PM
HB0551 /CH0489 (SB0506/CH0488) Washington County - Technology-Related Businesses - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements Washington County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 489
Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0559 /CH0048 (SB0408/CH0047) Washington County - Special Deputy Sheriffs Washington County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 48
Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0720 /CH0558 (SB0814/CH0557) Washington County - Salary Study Commission - Updating Salary and Expense Provisions Washington County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 558
Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0792 /CH0059 (SB0507/CH0058) Correctional Facilities - Inmate Programs in Washington County - Payment of Child Support Washington County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 59
Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1060 Washington County - Polling Places - Electioneering Boundaries Washington County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB1366 Alcoholic Beverages - Class CS Chain Store Licenses Delegate Barnes 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Economic Matters
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Delegate Jones 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1450 Creation of a State Debt - Washington County - Antietam Fire Company Renovations Delegate Donoghue 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1451 Creation of a State Debt - Washington County - Municipal Electric Light Plant Project Delegate Donoghue 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1511 (SB1042) Washington County Building Code Board of Appeals - Decisions Washington County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0299 Creation of a State Debt - Washington County - Lockhouse 44, Lock 44, and Western MD Railroad Lift Bridge Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 12:00 PM
SB0408 /CH0047 (HB0559/CH0048) Washington County - Special Deputy Sheriffs Senator Shank 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 47
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0506 /CH0488 (HB0551/CH0489) Washington County - Technology-Related Businesses - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements Senator Shank 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 488
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0507 /CH0058 (HB0792/CH0059) Correctional Facilities - Inmate Programs in Washington County - Payment of Child Support Senator Shank 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0508 /CH0060 (HB0546) Washington County - Public Facilities Bonds Senator Shank 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 60
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0535 /CH0495 (HB0253) Washington County - Amusement Devices - Tip Jars Senator Shank 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 495
Budget and Taxation
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0789 Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise Participation Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0814 /CH0557 (HB0720/CH0558) Washington County - Salary Study Commission - Updating Salary and Expense Provisions Senator Shank 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 557
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0934 (HB1372/CH0430) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1042 (HB1511) Washington County Building Code Board of Appeals - Decisions Senator Shank 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM