Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Washington County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0173
Title
Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0789
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wineries - Special Event Permits
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0810
Title
Workers' Compensation - Washington County - Volunteer Company - Fire and Rescue Academy Student
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0893
Title
Washington County - Adult Public Guardianship Review Board - Membership
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1161
Title
Washington County - Mobile Home Tax - Authorization
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1193 (SB0358)
Title
Sales and Use Tax Refund - Target Redevelopment Area - Washington County
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1300 (SB1000)
Title
Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1367
Title
Transportation - Western Maryland MARC Rail Extension - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1516
Title
Washington County - Opioid-Associated Disease Prevention and Outreach Program - Prohibition on Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1518
Title
Opioid-Exposed Newborns and Parents Addicted to Opioids - Mobile Application - Pilot Program (I'm Alive Today App)
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1598
Title
Washington County - Hotel Rental Tax - Rate and Distribution of Revenue
Sponsor
Delegate Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1653
Title
Washington County - Business Licenses - Zoning Certification Requirement
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0292
Title
Tri-County Council for Western Maryland - Membership
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0358 (HB1193)
Title
Sales and Use Tax Refund - Target Redevelopment Area - Washington County
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1000 (HB1300)
Title
Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1081
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0173 Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2020 - 11:00 AM
HB0789 Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wineries - Special Event Permits Washington County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0810 Workers' Compensation - Washington County - Volunteer Company - Fire and Rescue Academy Student Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0893 Washington County - Adult Public Guardianship Review Board - Membership Washington County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1161 Washington County - Mobile Home Tax - Authorization Washington County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1193 (SB0358) Sales and Use Tax Refund - Target Redevelopment Area - Washington County Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1300 (SB1000) Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation Speaker 6 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Appropriations
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Ways and Means
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
HB1367 Transportation - Western Maryland MARC Rail Extension - Study Delegate Corderman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Finance
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1516 Washington County - Opioid-Associated Disease Prevention and Outreach Program - Prohibition on Establishment Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1518 Opioid-Exposed Newborns and Parents Addicted to Opioids - Mobile Application - Pilot Program (I'm Alive Today App) Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1598 Washington County - Hotel Rental Tax - Rate and Distribution of Revenue Delegate Corderman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1653 Washington County - Business Licenses - Zoning Certification Requirement Washington County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0292 Tri-County Council for Western Maryland - Membership Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0358 (HB1193) Sales and Use Tax Refund - Target Redevelopment Area - Washington County Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB1000 (HB1300) Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB1081 Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/19/2020 1:15 PM