Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Washington County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0399
Title
Real Property – Required Notices for Contracts of Sale – Zones of Dewatering Influence
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0439 (SB0470)
Title
Institute for Innovation and Implementation - Pregnant, Expecting, and Parenting Students - Data Collection and Report
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0615
Title
Natural Resources - Sunday Deer Hunting and Archery Hunting Safety Zones - Prince George's County PG 402-21
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0929 (SB0680)
Title
Teachers’ Pension System – Vested Allowance – Break in Service
Sponsor
Delegate Arikan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0962
Title
Washington County - Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Programs - Essential Caregivers
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1044
Title
Washington County - Business Licenses - Zoning Certification Requirement
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1108
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event Permits for Wineries
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1374
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0199 (HB0114)
Title
Transportation - Maryland Transit Administration Funding and MARC Rail Extension Study (Transit Safety and Investment Act)
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0470 (HB0439)
Title
Institute for Innovation and Implementation - Pregnant, Expecting, and Parenting Students - Data Collection and Report
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0680 (HB0929)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Administration of Benefits - Clarification
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0869
Title
Statewide Transit Plan – Western Maryland MARC Rail Extension Study
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871
Title
Gaming - Sports and Event Wagering License - Washington County Minor League Baseball Team
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0399 Real Property – Required Notices for Contracts of Sale – Zones of Dewatering Influence Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2021 - 12:30 PM
HB0439 (SB0470) Institute for Innovation and Implementation - Pregnant, Expecting, and Parenting Students - Data Collection and Report Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0615 Natural Resources - Sunday Deer Hunting and Archery Hunting Safety Zones - Prince George's County PG 402-21 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0929 (SB0680) Teachers’ Pension System – Vested Allowance – Break in Service Delegate Arikan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0962 Washington County - Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Programs - Essential Caregivers Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1044 Washington County - Business Licenses - Zoning Certification Requirement Washington County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1108 Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event Permits for Wineries Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1374 Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Appropriations
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0199 (HB0114) Transportation - Maryland Transit Administration Funding and MARC Rail Extension Study (Transit Safety and Investment Act) Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0470 (HB0439) Institute for Innovation and Implementation - Pregnant, Expecting, and Parenting Students - Data Collection and Report Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0680 (HB0929) State Retirement and Pension System - Administration of Benefits - Clarification Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2021 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0869 Statewide Transit Plan – Western Maryland MARC Rail Extension Study Senator Corderman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0871 Gaming - Sports and Event Wagering License - Washington County Minor League Baseball Team Senator Corderman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page