Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Washington Suburban Sanitary District

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0408 /CH0539
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Connection Pipe Emergency Replacement Loan Program PG/MC 103-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0409
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Service Charges PG/MC 112-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0415
Title
Montgomery and Prince George's Counties - Public Utilities - Property Management PG/MC 109-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0416
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission – Water Leakage – Billing PG/MC 107–18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0417 /CH0770
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Funding Accountability and Transparency Act PG/MC 111-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0418
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Indirect Customer Assistance Program PG/MC 105-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0419 /CH0130
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Office of the Inspector General PG/MC 101-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1616 (SB0948)
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission – Minority Business Enterprises – Subcontracting PG/MC 115-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0948 (HB1616)
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission – Minority Business Enterprises – Subcontracting
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0408 /CH0539 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Connection Pipe Emergency Replacement Loan Program PG/MC 103-18 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 539
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0409 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Service Charges PG/MC 112-18 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0415 Montgomery and Prince George's Counties - Public Utilities - Property Management PG/MC 109-18 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0416 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission – Water Leakage – Billing PG/MC 107–18 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0417 /CH0770 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Funding Accountability and Transparency Act PG/MC 111-18 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 770
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0418 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Indirect Customer Assistance Program PG/MC 105-18 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0419 /CH0130 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Office of the Inspector General PG/MC 101-18 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130
Environment and Transportation
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1616 (SB0948) Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission – Minority Business Enterprises – Subcontracting PG/MC 115-18 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Health and Government Operations
SB0948 (HB1616) Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission – Minority Business Enterprises – Subcontracting Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:58 PM