Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Weapons -see also- Guns

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0050
Title
Public Safety - Use of Electronic Control Devices - Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0181
Title
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Guidelines for Use of Electronic Control Devices
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0313 /CH0443
Title
Montgomery County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone MC 10-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0739 /CH0802 (SB0941/CH0803)
Title
Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0941 /CH0803 (HB0739/CH0802)
Title
Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Standards
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0946
Title
Gun-Free Higher Education Zones
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0050 Public Safety - Use of Electronic Control Devices - Reports Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0181 Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Guidelines for Use of Electronic Control Devices Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0313 /CH0443 Montgomery County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone MC 10-17 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 443
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0739 /CH0802 (SB0941/CH0803) Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Standards Delegate Moon 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 802
Judiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0941 /CH0803 (HB0739/CH0802) Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Standards Senator Smith 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 803
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0946 Gun-Free Higher Education Zones Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:54 PM