Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Weapons -see also- Guns

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0199 /CH0592
Title
Wicomico County - Deer Hunting - Sundays
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0367 (SB0536)
Title
Public Safety - Education - Firearm Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0523
Title
Public Schools - Use of Lead Ammunition in School Programs - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0618 /CH0190 (SB0889/CH0191)
Title
Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Bow Hunting Season
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0619 /CH0192 (SB0890/CH0193)
Title
Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Muzzle Loader Season
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0620 /CH0188 (SB0888/CH0189)
Title
Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Firearms Season
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1110 (SB0140/CH0265)
Title
Washington County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1121
Title
Criminal Procedure - Law Enforcement Procedures - Use of Force
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1145
Title
Public Safety - Special Police Officers - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1221
Title
Natural Resources - Hunting - Sundays
Sponsor
Delegate Anderton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1373
Title
Baltimore City - School Resource Officers - Firearms
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0140 /CH0265 (HB1110)
Title
Washington County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0197
Title
Juvenile Law - Jurisdiction - Attempted Carjacking and Attempted Armed Carjacking
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0536 (HB0367)
Title
Public Safety - Education - Firearm Funding
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0793 /CH0025 (HB1094)
Title
Community Safety and Strengthening Act
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0843
Title
Baltimore City - Community Oversight and Accountability Commission of Baltimore City
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0888 /CH0189 (HB0620/CH0188)
Title
Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Firearms Season
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0889 /CH0191 (HB0618/CH0190)
Title
Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Bow Hunting Season
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0890 /CH0193 (HB0619/CH0192)
Title
Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Muzzle Loader Season
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1005
Title
Baltimore County - Hunting - Deer Management Permits
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0199 /CH0592 Wicomico County - Deer Hunting - Sundays Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 592
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0367 (SB0536) Public Safety - Education - Firearm Funding Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Judicial Proceedings
Appropriations
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Judicial Proceedings
HB0523 Public Schools - Use of Lead Ammunition in School Programs - Prohibition Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0618 /CH0190 (SB0889/CH0191) Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Bow Hunting Season Delegate Adams 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 190
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0619 /CH0192 (SB0890/CH0193) Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Muzzle Loader Season Delegate Adams 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 192
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0620 /CH0188 (SB0888/CH0189) Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Firearms Season Delegate Adams 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 188
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1110 (SB0140/CH0265) Washington County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1121 Criminal Procedure - Law Enforcement Procedures - Use of Force Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1145 Public Safety - Special Police Officers - Requirements Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1221 Natural Resources - Hunting - Sundays Delegate Anderton 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1373 Baltimore City - School Resource Officers - Firearms Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Judiciary
Judiciary
SB0140 /CH0265 (HB1110) Washington County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone Washington County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 265
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0197 Juvenile Law - Jurisdiction - Attempted Carjacking and Attempted Armed Carjacking Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0536 (HB0367) Public Safety - Education - Firearm Funding Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0793 /CH0025 (HB1094) Community Safety and Strengthening Act Senator Hayes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 25
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2019 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Judiciary
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0843 Baltimore City - Community Oversight and Accountability Commission of Baltimore City Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0888 /CH0189 (HB0620/CH0188) Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Firearms Season Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 189
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2019 - 10:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
SB0889 /CH0191 (HB0618/CH0190) Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Bow Hunting Season Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 191
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2019 - 10:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
SB0890 /CH0193 (HB0619/CH0192) Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Muzzle Loader Season Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 193
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2019 - 10:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
SB1005 Baltimore County - Hunting - Deer Management Permits Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM