Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Weather

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0071
Title
Homeowner's Insurance - Underwriting Based on Geographic Area
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0736 /CH0311 (HB0763)
Title
Insurance - Fraudulent Insurance Acts - Compensation for Deductible
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0979
Title
Environment - Watershed Implementation Plan - Conowingo Dam Environmental Assessment
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0071 Homeowner's Insurance - Underwriting Based on Geographic Area Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
1/31/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0736 /CH0311 (HB0763) Insurance - Fraudulent Insurance Acts - Compensation for Deductible Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0979 Environment - Watershed Implementation Plan - Conowingo Dam Environmental Assessment Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM
Click to return on the top page