Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Weather

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0153
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Leaving Dogs Outside and Unattended in Extreme Weather
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0514 /CH0429 (SB0258)
Title
Maryland Commission on Climate Change
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0684
Title
Homeowner's Insurance - Underwriting Standards - Deductibles
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0691
Title
Homeowner's Insurance - Notices to Policyholders - Required
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0881 (SB0256)
Title
Maryland Shoreline Risk Assessment, Preparation, and Adaptation Act
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1224 /CH0303
Title
Procurement - Contracts for Pretreatment and Removal of Snow and Ice
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0026
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Leaving Dogs Outside in Extreme Temperatures
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0256 (HB0881)
Title
Maryland Shoreline Risk Assessment, Preparation, and Adaptation Act
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0258 (HB0514/CH0429)
Title
Maryland Commission on Climate Change
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0153 Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Leaving Dogs Outside and Unattended in Extreme Weather Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0514 /CH0429 (SB0258) Maryland Commission on Climate Change Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0684 Homeowner's Insurance - Underwriting Standards - Deductibles Delegate Jameson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0691 Homeowner's Insurance - Notices to Policyholders - Required Delegate Jameson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0881 (SB0256) Maryland Shoreline Risk Assessment, Preparation, and Adaptation Act Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1224 /CH0303 Procurement - Contracts for Pretreatment and Removal of Snow and Ice Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 303
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0026 Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Leaving Dogs Outside in Extreme Temperatures Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
SB0256 (HB0881) Maryland Shoreline Risk Assessment, Preparation, and Adaptation Act Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0258 (HB0514/CH0429) Maryland Commission on Climate Change Senator Pinsky 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM