Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Weeds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0405 (SB0213)
Title
Natural Resources - State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Mandatory Funding and Repeal of Termination Date
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0808 /CH0278
Title
Weed Control - Noxious Weeds - Regulations and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0213 (HB0405)
Title
Natural Resources – State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund – Mandatory Funding and Termination Date
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0405 (SB0213) Natural Resources - State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Mandatory Funding and Repeal of Termination Date Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0808 /CH0278 Weed Control - Noxious Weeds - Regulations and Penalties Delegate Ghrist 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0213 (HB0405) Natural Resources – State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund – Mandatory Funding and Termination Date Senator Edwards 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM