Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Weeds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0877 (SB0582)
Title
Natural Resources - State Lakes Protection and Restoration Program and Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0092 /CH0519
Title
Secretary of Agriculture - Weed Control Law
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0491
Title
Regulation of Invasive Plants - Bamboo - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0582 (HB0877)
Title
Natural Resources - State Lakes Protection and Restoration Program and Fund
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0877 (SB0582) Natural Resources - State Lakes Protection and Restoration Program and Fund Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0092 /CH0519 Secretary of Agriculture - Weed Control Law Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 519
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2020 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0491 Regulation of Invasive Plants - Bamboo - Prohibitions Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0582 (HB0877) Natural Resources - State Lakes Protection and Restoration Program and Fund Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/8/2020 3:36 PM