Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Weights and Measures

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0233 /CH0080
Title
Motor Vehicles - Calculation of Length - Loading Devices
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0506 (SB0410/CH0168)
Title
Baltimore City - Vehicle Laws - Traffic Safety
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1019 (SB0532)
Title
Farmers' Rights Act
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1096
Title
Agriculture - Weight and Measure Requirements - Exemption for Biodiesel Purchasing Cooperative
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0410 /CH0168 (HB0506)
Title
Baltimore City - Vehicle Laws - Traffic Safety
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0532 (HB1019)
Title
Farmers' Rights Act
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0233 /CH0080 Motor Vehicles - Calculation of Length - Loading Devices Delegate Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0506 (SB0410/CH0168) Baltimore City - Vehicle Laws - Traffic Safety Delegate Anderson 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1019 (SB0532) Farmers' Rights Act Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1096 Agriculture - Weight and Measure Requirements - Exemption for Biodiesel Purchasing Cooperative Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0410 /CH0168 (HB0506) Baltimore City - Vehicle Laws - Traffic Safety Senator Gladden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0532 (HB1019) Farmers' Rights Act Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM